EP3840347 - ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING EXPERT INFORMATION AND METHOD OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitel Networks Corporation 4000 Innovation Drive Kanata, ON K2K 3K1 / CA | [2023/36] |
Former [2023/16] | For all designated states Mitel Networks Corporation 4000 Innovation Drive Kanata Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3K1 / CA | ||
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Mitel Networks Corporation 4000 Innovation Drive Kanata, ON K2K 3K1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braganza, Jonathan 18 Seymour Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2E 6P2 / CA | 02 /
Ghantous, Justin 24 Hampel Crescent Ottawa, K2S 1E4 / CA | 03 /
Lee, Kevin 11 Balding Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2K 2L4 / CA | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | McDougall, James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 20172620.5 | 01.05.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | US201916719787 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: US201916719787 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840347 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3840347 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/523 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H04M3/5233 (EP,US);
G06F16/90332 (US);
G06F16/90344 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
H04M3/5237 (US);
H04M2201/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON EXPERTENINFORMATIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING EXPERT INFORMATION AND METHOD OF USING SAME | [2021/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION ÉLECTRONIQUE PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS EXPERTES ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 17.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017243137 (MANDEL EUGENE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] ** paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * |