EP3738993 - SLOW RELEASE OF INSECT REPELLENT COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/37] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEFER, Sascha Auf dem Hüls 41 40822 Mettmann / DE | 02 /
SAUF, Silvia Hauptstraße 107 42555 Velbert / DE | 03 /
KROPF, Christian Haydnstr. 7 40724 Hilden / DE | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2021/37] |
Former [2020/47] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20172692.4 | 04.05.2020 | [2020/47] | Priority number, date | DE201910112267 | 10.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019112267 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738993 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3738993 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/388, C08L83/08, A01N37/18, A61Q17/02 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
C08G77/388 (EP);
A01N47/16 (EP);
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61Q17/02 (EP);
C08G77/26 (EP);
C08L83/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERZÖGERTE FREISETZUNG EINER INSEKTEN ABWEHRENDEN VERBINDUNG | [2020/47] | English: | SLOW RELEASE OF INSECT REPELLENT COMPOUND | [2020/47] | French: | LIBÉRATION RETARDÉE D'UN COMPOSÉ INSECTIFUGE | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 27.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2020 | AL | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | IE | 04.05.2022 | LU | 04.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 04.05.2020 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007093297 (SALTIGO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * examples 2, 3, 6-9 *; | [A]EP3175865 (SMART INOVATION LDA [PT]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1, 4, 5, 7 * | by applicant | WO2017094600 | EP1738745 | EP1762221 | WO2018223181 | WO2018039376 |