Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3711750 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3711750



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(56)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 299
10.07.2024 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.09.2023 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
10.08.2023 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.07.2023 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.07.2023 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
28.07.2023 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.05.2023 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.05.2023 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.05.2023 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.05.2023 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.05.2023 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 33
15.05.2023 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 35
31.03.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.03.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
31.03.2023 Description Search / examination 2
31.03.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.03.2023 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
07.02.2023 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.02.2023 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.02.2023 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.02.2023 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.02.2023 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 33
07.02.2023 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 35
07.12.2022 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.03.2021 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.03.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
23.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.09.2020 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.08.2020 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.08.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.08.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 2
17.08.2020 European search report Search / examination 3
17.08.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
05.08.2020 Search started Search / examination 1
20.07.2020 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
15.07.2020 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Search / examination 1
15.07.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 3
26.06.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.05.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.05.2020 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
04.05.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.05.2020 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.05.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
04.05.2020 Description Search / examination 19
04.05.2020 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
04.05.2020 Drawings Search / examination 15
04.05.2020 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
29.02.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43