Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
09.06.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.10.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
06.05.2020 | Change - representative |