Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020358249 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019206508 | 07.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200130176 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019206508 | 07.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020188256 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019206508 | 07.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL274531 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019206508 | 07.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111916992 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019206508 | 07.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3080453 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019206508 | 07.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3736923 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019206508 | 07.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102019206508 | 12.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019206508 | 07.05.2019 |