EP3736923 - SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE AND LIDAR TRANSMISSION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibeo Automotive Systems GmbH Merkurring 60-62 22143 Hamburg / DE | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakspiel, Stefan Am Dorfanger 13 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 20173218.7 | 06.05.2020 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | DE201910206508 | 07.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019206508 | [2020/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736923 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/022, H01S5/183, G01S7/00, H01L23/00 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
H01S5/183 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
H01S5/0261 (CN);
G01S7/481 (EP);
G01S7/4815 (CN);
G01S7/484 (CN,US);
H01L23/488 (US);
H01L24/10 (KR);
H01L24/14 (US);
H01L24/42 (KR);
H01L24/97 (KR);
H01S5/02325 (EP);
H01S5/02345 (EP);
H01S5/18 (CN);
G01S7/4808 (US);
G01S7/4813 (US);
G01S7/4861 (US);
H01L2224/131 (EP);
H01L2224/16227 (EP);
H01L2224/1703 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/48465 (EP);
H01L2224/73204 (EP);
H01L2224/73207 (EP);
H01L2224/73253 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2224/92125 (EP);
H01L24/13 (EP);
H01L24/16 (EP);
H01L24/17 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP);
H01L24/73 (EP);
H01L24/92 (EP);
H01L2924/15192 (EP);
H01L2924/15311 (EP);
H01L2924/1815 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITER-PACKAGE UND LIDAR-SENDEEINHEIT | [2020/46] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE AND LIDAR TRANSMISSION UNIT | [2020/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET ÉMETTEUR LIDAR | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005087747 (YAMADA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0042] - [0053] - [0066] - [0098]; figures 1-3 * [I] 10,13,15; | [XI]US2011044369 (ANDRY PAUL S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-13 * paragraphs [0024] - [0033] - [0040]; figures 1-5,10 * [I] 10,15; | [XI]US9798087 (MATHAI SAGI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 3, line 13 - column 6, line 41; figures 1,2 *[I] 15 | by applicant | WO2017081294 |