EP3736350 - MULTILAYER SLIDING BEARING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miba Gleitlager Austria GmbH Dr. Mitterbauer-Strasse 3 4663 Laakirchen / AT | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERHARD, Alexander Waldbach 24 4816 Gschwandt / AT | 02 /
SCHINAGL, Matthias Drouotstraße 1 4020 Linz / AT | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes, et al Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 20173232.8 | 06.05.2020 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | AT20190050412 | 07.05.2019 Original published format: AT 504122019 | [2020/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736350 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3736350 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/01, C22C9/02, C22C9/04, C22C9/05, C22C9/06, C22C30/02, C22C1/10, C22C32/00, F16C33/06, F16C33/12 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
F16C33/121 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C9/00 (AT,US);
F16C33/06 (CN);
F16C33/122 (AT,CN,KR,US);
B22F5/106 (EP);
B22F7/08 (EP);
C22C1/0425 (EP);
C22C1/10 (EP);
C22C29/00 (AT);
C22C30/02 (EP,US);
C22C32/00 (EP);
C22C32/0089 (EP);
C22C9/01 (EP,US);
C22C9/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C9/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C9/05 (EP,US);
C22C9/06 (EP,US);
C22C9/10 (US);
C23C20/00 (US);
F16C17/00 (AT);
F16C17/02 (US);
F16C33/10 (CN);
F16C33/127 (EP);
F16C33/14 (AT,CN);
C21D9/40 (EP);
F16C17/022 (EP);
F16C2204/10 (CN);
F16C2204/12 (EP,KR);
F16C2204/14 (EP,KR);
F16C2220/06 (CN);
F16C2240/90 (EP);
F16C2360/22 (EP);
F16C2360/31 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2020/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTGLEITLAGERELEMENT | [2020/46] | English: | MULTILAYER SLIDING BEARING ELEMENT | [2020/46] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE PALIER COULISSANT MULTICOUCHE | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 07.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23170061.8 / EP4234964 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | IE | 06.05.2023 | LU | 06.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | FR | 03.07.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
IE | 06.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 03.05.2023 | |
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 03.05.2023 | |
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 03.05.2023 | |
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | GR | 04.08.2023 | |
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011127513 (MIBA GLEITLAGER GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XD]US2012082588 (KOBAYASHI TAKESKI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-5,8,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0034] - [0063]; tables 1-6 *; | [AD]US2012121455 (MURRAY MICHAEL [US], et al) [AD] 1-19* figures 2-7; claims 1,2,4,9,10,11,12,14; tables 2-12 *; | [XP]WO2019144173 (MIBA GLEITLAGER AUSTRIA GMBH [AT]) [XP] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007126006 | WO2010137483 | US2012082588 | US2012121455 | DE202016101661U |