EP3739524 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING A MACHINE LEARNING MODEL AGAINST EXTRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Derks, Gerardus Antonius Franciscus c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | 02 /
Ermans, Brian c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | 03 /
Michiels, Wilhelmus Petrus Adrianus Johannus c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | 04 /
van Vredendaal, Christine c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Richard NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 20173439.9 | 07.05.2020 | [2020/47] | Priority number, date | US201916414068 | 16.05.2019 Original published format: US201916414068 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739524 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N20/00, G06N3/08, G06N7/00, G06N5/00, G06N20/10, G06N20/20 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
G06N3/049 (EP);
G06F21/554 (US);
G06F21/52 (US);
G06N20/10 (EP);
G06N20/20 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/088 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
G06F2221/033 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM SCHUTZ EINES MASCHINENLERNMODELLS GEGEN EXTRAKTION | [2020/47] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING A MACHINE LEARNING MODEL AGAINST EXTRACTION | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION D'UN MODÈLE D'APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE CONTRE L'EXTRACTION | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 18.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019050564 (POGORELIK OLEG [IS], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0036] ** figures 6a, 6b * |