EP3730896 - MEASUREMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw PLC New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grzesiak, Jean-Louis 15 rue Albert Einstein Champs sur Marne 77447 Marne la Vallée / FR | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Rolfe, Edward William, et al Patent Department Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 20173553.7 | 29.10.2009 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | GB20080019828 | 29.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0819828 | GB20080019826 | 29.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0819826 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730896 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3730896 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/008, G01B5/20, G01B21/04, G01B21/20, G01B5/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G01B5/008 (EP,US);
G01B21/04 (EP);
G01B21/042 (US);
G01B21/20 (EP);
G01B5/0032 (EP);
G01B5/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | G01B5/008, G01B5/20, G01B21/04, G01B21/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2020/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MESSVERFAHREN | [2020/44] | English: | MEASUREMENT METHOD | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 23.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09749174.0 / EP2364427 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | LU | 29.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | FR | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 29.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
FR | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 29.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004189944 (KAUFMAN STEVEN P [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1877727 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030]; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]EP1877729 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 102] - [0103]; figures 3,4,15,16 *; | [Y] - Irenee Tyvaert ET AL, "A metodology to Create STL Files from Data Point Clouds Generated with a Coordinate Measuring Machine", 1999 International Solid Freeform Fabrication Symposium, (19990615), URL: https://repositories.lib.utexas.edu/bitstream/handle/2152/73571/1999-006-Tyvaert.pdf?sequence=2&isAllowed=y, (20200917), XP055731767 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 49 * | [Y] - Jason Kantz ET AL, "Application of Sweeping Techniques to Reverse Engineering", A thesis submitted in partial fulfillment of the requirements for the degree of Masters in Computer and Information Science, (20031219), pages 1 - 63, URL: https://epo.summon.serialssolutions.com/2.0.0/link/0/eLvHCXMwtV1LS8QwEA4uXrz4BtcH5OA12EfSNt6WRVfwttSDp5JmExTUFVwQ_fVOmqRNd8UH4qUsadOWzDD7zTTzfQidcsCgtKaC6IhpQmUhSZFRTWo6y2qlC5k0kiy3Y1pO8unEqDX40kA39q-WhjGwtemc_YW125vCAPwGm8MRrA7HH9l91H2RbhpSXpVqWqJKT9baUDpMldmOoUI6whCmrtYJHWg10mmWxbvZ8nn_6NS_uuBhv-J, (20200623), XP055707995 [Y] 1-15 * pages 22-26 * | [Y] - ELMARAGHY W H ELMARAGHY H A ET AL, "DETERMINATION OF ACTUAL GEOMETRIC DEVIATIONS USING COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE DATA", MANUFACTURING REVIEW, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, US, (19900301), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 0896-1611, pages 32 - 39, XP000125354 [Y] 7-9 * pages 34-37 * | [Y] - HSU TAO-HSIEN ET AL, "An iterative coordinate setup algorithm for airfoil blades inspection", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADVANCED MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, LONDON, vol. 26, no. 7, doi:10.1007/S00170-003-2040-0, ISSN 0268-3768, (20051001), pages 797 - 807, (20051001), XP036442965 [Y] 7-9 * figures 11-12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00170-003-2040-0 | by applicant | GB1551218 | WO9007097 | EP0402440 | WO9520747 |