EP3907878 - ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE BEHAVIOUR OF AN ELECTRIC ROTATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deeg, Christian 90518 Altdorf / DE | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 20173618.8 | 08.05.2020 | [2021/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907878 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02P23/14, G01R31/34, G05B23/02 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H02P23/14 (EP,US);
G05B23/0221 (EP);
H02K11/0094 (US);
H02K11/20 (US);
G05B19/042 (EP);
G05B2219/37537 (EP);
H02P2207/01 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BETRIEBSVERHALTENSERMITTLUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN ROTATORISCHEN MASCHINE | [2021/45] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE BEHAVIOUR OF AN ELECTRIC ROTATING MACHINE | [2021/45] | French: | AGENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DU COMPORTEMENT DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ROTATIVE | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/42] | 01.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6199018 (QUIST NANCY L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11,13 * column 3, line 19 - line 48; figures 1, 2A,4 * * column 6, line 46 - line 51; figure 2B * * column 7, line 38 - line 49 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 4 * * column 3, line 49 - line 56 * * column 12, line 51 - line 60 * [Y] 4,12 [I] 5,8; | [IY]EP3322088 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [[0024]] - paragraph [[0030]]; figures 1-2 *[Y] 4,12 |