EP3730615 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF A GENETIC CONDITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sangamo Therapeutics, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard, Suite A100 Richmond, CA 94804 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONWAY, Anthony c/o Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA California 94804 / US | 02 /
COST, Gregory J. c/o Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA California 94804 / US | 03 /
DEKELVER, Russell c/o Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA California 94804 / US | 04 /
REBAR, Edward J. c/o Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA California 94804 / US | 05 /
REIK, Andreas c/o Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA California 94804 / US | 06 /
URNOV, Fyodor c/o Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA California 94804 / US | 07 /
WANG, Jianbin c/o Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA California 94804 / US | 08 /
ZHANG, H. Steve c/o Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA California 94804 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Weiss, Wolfgang Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20173697.2 | 15.05.2014 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | US201361823689P | 15.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361823689 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3730615 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3730615 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N9/22, C12N15/90, C12N15/63, C07K14/805 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/805 (EP);
C12N15/907 (US);
C07K2/00 (US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/63 (EP);
C12N15/90 (US);
C12N15/902 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C07K2319/81 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES GENETISCHEN LEIDENS | [2020/44] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF A GENETIC CONDITION | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE GÉNÉTIQUE | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 09.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14797155.0 / EP2997146 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010030963 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-32 *; | [A]WO2013044008 (SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * pages 6-19; examples 1-8; claims 1-10 *; | [XP]WO2013126794 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US]) [XP] 1,4,7,9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] *; | [AP]WO2014036219 (SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [AP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0022] *; | [Y] - MALI P. ET AL, "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9", SCIENCE, US, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1232033, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 823 - 826, XP055300091 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | [Y] - THOMAS GAJ ET AL, "ZFN, TALEN, and CRISPR/Cas-based methods for genome engineering", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130501), doi:10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004, ISSN 0167-7799, XP055065263 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5, column 2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004 | [Y] - VITTORIO SEBASTIANO ET AL, "In Situ Genetic Correction of the Sickle Cell Anemia Mutation in Human Induced Pluripotent Stem Cells Using Engineered Zinc Finger Nucleases", STEM CELLS., US, (20111025), vol. 29, no. 11, doi:10.1002/stem.718, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 1717 - 1726, XP055260055 [Y] 1,4,7,9,13-15 * abstract * * page 1718, column 2; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/stem.718 | [Y] - DANIEL E BAUER ET AL, "HbF-Associated Genetic Variation Marks an Erythroid Regulatory Element Essential for BCL11A Transcription and Subsequent Stage-Specific Globin Expression", vol. 120, ISSN 0006-4971, (20120101), pages 1 - 5, BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/120/21/828?sso-checked=true, (20170313), XP008183703 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012-06-292078 | [XP] - "Human HBB targeted gRNA sequence, SEQ ID 888.", Geneseq, (20150226), Database accession no. BBT87742, URL: EBI, XP002764441 [XP] 1,4,7,9,13-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - "BCL11A gene specific guide RNA (gRNA) targeting domain, SEQ: 9820.", Geneseq, (20151203), Database accession no. BCF10556, URL: EBI, XP002767931 [XP] 1,4,7,9,13-15 * sequence . * | [A] - V. G. SANKARAN, "Targeted Therapeutic Strategies for Fetal Hemoglobin Induction", HEMATOLOGY, (20111201), vol. 2011, no. 1, doi:10.1182/asheducation-2011.1.459, ISSN 1520-4391, pages 459 - 465, XP055108964 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 461, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/asheducation-2011.1.459 | [A] - RAECHEL PERALTA ET AL, "Targeting BCL11A and KLF1 For The Treatment Of Sickle Cell Disease and [beta]-Thalassemia In Vitro using Antisense Oligonucleotides", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20130101), vol. 122, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1 - 4, XP008183701 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "Sequence 5522 from Patent WO2012149438.", EMBL, (20130404), Database accession no. JA922571, URL: EBI, XP002768137 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - XAVIER M ANGUELA ET AL, "Paper: In Vivo Genome Editing of Liver Albumin for Therapeutic Gene Expression: Rescue of Hemophilic Mice Via Integration of Factor 9", 54TH ASH ANNUAL MEETING AND EXPOSITION, (20121108), page 751, XP055174905 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "Human albumin (ALB) gene-specific PCR primer, SEQ ID 5.", Geneseq, (20120412), Database accession no. AZT61077, URL: EBI, XP002768138 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ANDREW WILBER ET AL, "Abstract", BLOOD, US, (20110414), vol. 117, no. 15, doi:10.1182/blood-2010-11-316893, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3945 - 3953, XP055727086 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2010-11-316893 | [AP] - T. J. CRADICK ET AL, "CRISPR/Cas9 systems targeting -globin and CCR5 genes have substantial off-target activity", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20131101), vol. 41, no. 20, doi:10.1093/nar/gkt714, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 9584 - 9592, XP055186069 [AP] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt714 | [A] - LE CONG ET AL, "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, US, (20130214), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055458249 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | by applicant | US4186183 | US4217344 | US4235871 | US4261975 | US4485054 | US4501728 | US4774085 | US4797368 | US4837028 | US4897355 | US4946787 | US5049386 | WO9116024 | WO9117424 | US5173414 | US5176996 | WO9324641 | US5356802 | US5422251 | WO9519431 | US5436150 | US5487994 | WO9606166 | US5585245 | US5591616 | US5789538 | WO9837186 | WO9844350 | WO9853058 | WO9853059 | WO9853060 | WO9853057 | WO9854311 | US5925523 | GB2338237 | US6007988 | US6008336 | US6013453 | WO0027878 | US6140081 | US6140466 | US6200759 | US6242568 | WO0160970 | WO0188197 | WO0216536 | US6410248 | US6453242 | WO02077227 | WO02099084 | US6503717 | WO03016496 | US6534261 | US6599692 | US6607882 | US2003232410 | US6689558 | US6824978 | US2005026157 | US2005064474 | US6933113 | US6936243 | US2005208489 | US6979539 | US7013219 | US2006063231 | US7067317 | US7163824 | WO2007014275 | US7262054 | US2007218528 | US2008131962 | US2008159996 | US2008188000 | US2008299580 | US2009054985 | US2009068164 | US2009093366 | US2009104700 | US2009123626 | US2009205083 | US2010047805 | US2010199389 | US2010218264 | US2010291048 | US7888121 | US7914796 | US7951925 | US7972854 | US2011167521 | US2011182867 | US2011189775 | US2011201055 | US2011207221 | US8034598 | US2011265198 | US2012017290 | US8110379 | US2012093787 | US8329986 | US8409861 | US2013122591 | US2013137104 | US2013177983 | US2013177960 | US8563314 | US8586526 | US8623618 | US8697359 | - TERADA et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20020000), vol. 20, no. 10, page 1030 | - TERADA et al., Plant Physiol, (20070000), vol. 144, no. 2, page 846 | - D'HALLUIN et al., Plant Biotechnology J., (20080000), vol. 6, no. 1, page 93 | - HALPIN, Plant Biotechnology Journal, (20050000), vol. 3, pages 141 - 155 | - URNOV et al., Nature, (20100000), vol. 435, no. 7042, pages 646 - 51 | - LEI et al., Cell, (20130000), vol. 152, no. 5, pages 1173 - 1183 | - JINEK et al., Science, (20120000), vol. 337, page 816 | - HWANG et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 3, page 227 | - KORMANN et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20110000), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 154 - 157 | - SANDERJOUNG, Nature Biotech, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 4, page 347 | - VOON et al., Haematologica, (20080000), vol. 93, no. 8, page 1288 | - DESIMONE, Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19820000), vol. 79, no. 14, pages 4428 - 31 | - LEY et al., N. Engl. J. Medicine, (19820000), vol. 307, pages 1469 - 1475 | - LEY et al., Blood, (19830000), vol. 62, pages 370 - 380 | - CONSTANTOULAKIS et al., Blood, (19880000), vol. 72, no. 6, pages 1961 - 1967 | - THEIN et al., Hum. Mol. Genet, (20090000), vol. 18, no. R2, pages R216 - R223 | - SANKARAN et al., Science, (20080000), vol. 321, pages 1839 - 964 | - BORG et al., Haematologica, (20110000), vol. 96, no. 5, pages 635 - 638 | - ZHOU et al., Nat Genet, (20100000), vol. 42, no. 9, pages 742 - 744 | - BAUER et al., Science, (20130000), vol. 342, no. 6155, pages 253 - 7 | - HARTEVELDHIGGS, Orphanet Journal of Rare Diseases, (20100000), vol. 5, page 13 | - CHUI et al., Blood, (20030000), vol. 101, no. 3, page 791 | - JASIN et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19960000), vol. 93, page 8804 | - LEE et al., Pharrn. Res., (20040000), vol. 7, pages 1229 - 1232 | - GRAHAM et al., Genet Vaccines Ther., (20080000), vol. 3, pages 6 - 9 | - DAVIE, Brit Med Bull, (20080000), vol. 86, no. 1, page 109 | - KUMARI, FEBS J., (20090000), vol. 276, no. 22, page 6455 | - LUZON-TORO, Hum Mol Genet, (20070000), vol. 16, no. 17, page 2031 | - DI PROSPEROFISCHBECK, Nature Reviews Genetics, (20050000), vol. 6, pages 756 - 765 | - DRYJA et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (20000000), vol. 41, pages 3124 - 3127 | - OLSSON et al., Neuron, (19920000), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 815 - 30 | - LIU et al., Proc Nat'l Acad Sci, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 4554 - 4559 | - GOTO et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (19950000), vol. 36, pages 62 - 71 | - KEREM et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 245, pages 1073 - 1080 | - KREDA et al., Mol Biol Cell, (20050000), vol. 16, pages 2154 - 2167 | - OROZCO et al., Am J Med Genet., (19940000), vol. 51, no. 2, pages 137 - 9 | - CHENG et al., Cell, (19900000), vol. 63, pages 827 - 834 | - KEREM et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 8447 - 8451 | - NOWAKDAVIES, EMBO Reports, (20040000), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 872 - 876 | - BENDLE et al., Nature Medicine, (20100000), vol. 16, pages 565 - 570 | - VAN LOENEN et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20100000), vol. 107, pages 10972 - 7 | - PARDOLL, Nat Rev, (20120000), vol. 12, page 252 | - FREEMAN et al., J Exp Med, (20060000), vol. 203, no. 10, pages 2223 - 2227 | - PETROVAS et al., J Immunol., (20090000), vol. 183, no. 2, pages 1120 - 32 | - DOTTI, Blood, (20090000), vol. 114, no. 8, pages 1457 - 58 | - BARBER et al., Nature, (20060000), vol. 439, no. 9, pages 682 - 687 | - PARDOLL, ONCOLOGYE BUSINESS REVIEW | - ATTIA et al., J ClinOncol, (20050000), vol. 23, no. 25, pages 6043 - 6053 | - WEBER, Oncologist, (20070000), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 864 - 872 | - CHICAYBAM et al., Int Rev Immunol, (20110000), vol. 30, pages 294 - 311 | - FEHLING et al., Science, (19990000), vol. 265, pages 1234 - 1237 | - GRANDEA et al., Immunity, (20000000), vol. 13, pages 213 - 222 | - GARBI et al., Nat Immunol, (20000000), vol. 1, pages 234 - 238 | - VILLARD et al., MCB, (20000000), vol. 20, no. 10, pages 3364 - 3376 | - LEIBUND GUT-LANDMANN, Eur. J. Immunol, (20040000), vol. 34, pages 1513 - 1525 | - TOMAZ et al., Plant Physiol., (20100000), vol. 154, no. 3, pages 1143 - 1157 | - GOODMAN, M.M.NEWTON K.J.STUBER, C.W., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19810000), vol. 78, pages 1783 - 1785 | - IMSANDE, J. et al., J. Heredity, (20010000), vol. 92, pages 333 - 338 | - JINEK et al., J. HEREDITY | - FIELDS et al., Natl re, (19890000), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246 | - CHANG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 4959 - 4963 | - BITINAITE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19980000), vol. 95, no. 10, pages 570 - 10 | - "Chromatin", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, Academic Press, (19990000), vol. 304 | - "Chromatin Protocols", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, Humana Press, (19990000), vol. 119 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Advances in Applied Mathematics, (19810000), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - GRIBSKOV, Nucl. Acids Res., (19860000), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 6745 - 6763 | - TRATSCHIN et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19850000), vol. 5, pages 3251 - 3260 | - GODDEBICKERTON, J. Mol. Evol., (20060000), vol. 62, pages 718 - 729 | - LILLESTOL et al., Archaea, (20060000), vol. 2, pages 59 - 72 | - MAKAROVA et al., Biol. Direct, (20060000), vol. 1, page 7 | - SOREK et al., Nat. Rev. illic obiol., (20080000), vol. 6, pages 181 - 186 | - JANSEN et al., Mol. Microbiol., (20020000), vol. 43, pages 1565 - 1575 | - MAKAROVA et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20020000), vol. 30, pages 482 - 496 | - HAFT et al., PLoS Comput. Biol., (20050000), vol. 1, no. 6, pages 474 - 483 | - FONFARA, Nuc Acid Res, (20130000), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 2377 - 2590 | - JINEK et al., NUC ACID RES | - HALE et al., RNA, (20080000), vol. 14, pages 2572 - 2579 | - TANG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20020000), vol. 99, pages 7536 - 7541 | - TANG et al., Mol. Microbiol., (20050000), vol. 55, pages 469 - 481 | - HAFT et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (20030000), vol. 31, pages 371 - 373 | - BATEMANHAFT, Briefings Bioinformatics, (20020000), vol. 3, pages 236 - 245 | - HAFT et al., PLoS Computational Biol., (20050000), vol. 1, no. 6, page e60 | - TATUSOV et al., Science, (19970000), vol. 278, pages 631 - 637 | - TATUSOV et al., BMC Bioinfonnatics, (20030000), vol. 4, no. 1, page 41 | - MAKAROVA et al., Nuc. Acids Res., (20020000), vol. 30, pages 482 - 496 | - BELFORT et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3379 - 3388 | - LI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 2764 - 2768 | - LI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 4275 - 4279 | - KIM et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 883 - 887 | - KIM et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, no. 31, pages 978 - 31 | - ROBERTS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20030000), vol. 31, pages 418 - 420 | - SANDERJOUNG, NATURE BIOTECH | - ESVELTCIL, Nat Meth, (20130000), vol. 10, no. 11, page 1116 | - NEHLS et al., Science, (19960000), vol. 272, pages 886 - 889 | - ANDERSON, Science, (19920000), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813 | - MITANICASKEY, TIBTECH, (19930000), vol. 11, pages 167 - 175 | - MILLER, Nature, (19920000), vol. 357, pages 455 - 460 | - VAN BRUNT, Biotechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1149 - 1154 | - VIGNE, Restorative Neurology and Neuroscience, (19950000), vol. 8, pages 35 - 36 | - KREMERPERRICAUDET, British Medical Bulletin, (19950000), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 31 - 44 | - BLAESE et al., Science, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 475 - 480 | - YU et al., Gene Therapy, (19940000), vol. 1, pages 13 - 26 | - BLAESE et al., Cancer Gene Ther., (19950000), vol. 2, pages 291 - 297 | - REMY et al., Bioconjugate Chem., (19940000), vol. 5, pages 647 - 654 | - GAO et al., Gene Therapy, (19950000), vol. 2, pages 710 - 722 | - AHMAD et al., Cancer Res., (19920000), vol. 52, pages 4817 - 4820 | - MACDIARMID et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20090000), vol. 27, no. 7, page 643 | - BUCHSCHER et al., J. Virol., (19920000), vol. 66, pages 1635 - 1640 | - SOMMERFELT et al., Virol., (19900000), vol. 176, pages 58 - 59 | - SAMULSKI et al., J. Virol., (19890000), vol. 63, pages 03822 - 3828 | - MILLER et al., J. Virol., (19910000), vol. 65, pages 2220 - 2224 | - WEST et al., Virology, (19870000), vol. 160, pages 38 - 47 | - KOTIN, Human Gene Therapy, (19940000), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801 | - MUZYCZKA, J. Clin. Invest., (19940000), vol. 94, page 1351 | - TRATSCHIN et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19840000), vol. 4, pages 2072 - 2081 | - HERMONATMUZYCZKA, PNAS, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6466 - 6470 | - DUNBAR et al., Blood, (19950000), vol. 85, pages 3048 - 305 | - KOHN et al., Nat. Med., (19950000), vol. 1, pages 1017 - 102 | - MALECH et al., PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, no. 22, pages 12133 - 12138 | - ELLEM et al., Immunol Immunother., (19970000), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 10 - 20 | - ALVAREZ et al., Hum. Gene Ther., (19970000), vol. 5, pages 597 - 613 | - WAGNER et al., Lancet, (19980000), vol. 351, no. 9117, pages 1702 - 3 | - KEARNS et al., Gene Ther., (19960000), vol. 9, pages 748 - 55 | - STERMAN et al., Hum. Gene Ther., (19980000), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 1083 - 1089 | - ROSENECKER et al., Infection, (19960000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 5 - 10 | - WELSH, Hum. Gene Ther., (19950000), vol. 2, pages 205 - 18 | - TOPF et al., Gene Ther., (19980000), vol. 5, pages 507 - 513 | - HAN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 9747 - 9751 | - ORY et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 11382 - 11388 | - ZUFFERY et al., J. Virol., (19980000), vol. 72, pages 9873 - 9880 | - FOLLENZI et al., Nature Genetics, (20000000), vol. 25, pages 217 - 222 | - BOULTON et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19890000), vol. 12, pages 31 - 40 | - KLEIN et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 4305 - 4309 | - GRIMSLEY et al., Nature, (19870000), vol. 325, pages 1677 - 179 | - HORSCH et al., Science, (19840000), vol. 233, pages 496 - 498 | - FRALEY et al., Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci. USA, (19830000), vol. 80, page 4803 | - CHUNG et al., Trends Plant Sci., (20060000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 1 - 4 | - BEVAN, Nuc. Acid Res., (19840000), vol. 12, pages 8711 - 8721 | - HORSCH et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 227, pages 1229 - 1231 | - BEVAN et al., Ann. Rev. Genet, (19820000), vol. 16, pages 357 - 384 | - ROGERS et al., Methods Enzymol., (19860000), vol. 118, pages 627 - 641 | - PASZKOWSKI et al., EMBO J, (19840000), vol. 3, pages 2717 - 2722 | - HOOYKASS-VAN SLOGTEREN et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 311, pages 763 - 764 | - GOULD et al., Plant Physiol., (19910000), vol. 95, pages 426 - 434 | - POTRYKUS et al., Molec. Gen. Genet., (19850000), vol. 199, pages 169 - 177 | - FROMM et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19850000), vol. 82, pages 5824 - 5828 | - SHIMAMOTO, Nature, (19890000), vol. 338, pages 274 - 276 | - D'HALLUIN et al., Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 1495 - 1505 | - KAEPPLER et al., Plant Cell Reporter, (19900000), vol. 9, pages 415 - 418 | - GORDON-KAMM et al., Plant Ce, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 603 - 618 | - "Protoplasts Isolation and Culture", EVANS et al., Handbook of Plant Cell Culture, Macmillian Publishing Company, (19830000), pages 124 - 176 | - BINDING, Regeneration of Plants, Plant Protoplasts, CRC Press, (19850000), pages 21 - 73 | - KLEE et al., Ann. Rev. of Plant Phys., (19870000), vol. 38, pages 467 - 486 | WO1994US05700 |