EP3907645 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE ASSEMBLY OF ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secure Thingz Limited Hudson House Maris Lane Trumpington, Cambridge CB2 9FF / GB | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPITZ, Stephan 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | 02 /
POVEY, Haydn Cambridge, CB2 9FF / GB | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20173716.0 | 08.05.2020 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907645 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/71, H04L9/32, H04L29/06, H04L9/08, G06F21/57 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
G06F21/71 (EP);
G06F21/57 (EP);
H04L63/062 (EP);
H04L9/0819 (EP);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] |
Former [2021/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER MONTAGE VON ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/45] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE ASSEMBLY OF ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2021/45] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER L'ASSEMBLAGE DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 06.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016085995 (POORNACHANDRAN RAJESH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * figure 5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] *; | [I]US2018097639 (GULATI RAJEEV [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * figure 9 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraphs [0118] - [0123] * * paragraph [0194] - paragraph [0201] *; | [A]US2019207759 (CHAN MICHAEL J T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 3B * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US2020044859 (SRIVASTAVA RAJ GAURAV [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0048] ** paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * |