08.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
27.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] |
15.12.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
13.12.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.12.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.12.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.09.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.08.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
04.08.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.04.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
23.04.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
21.04.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.10.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
11.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|