|
26.03.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2024 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.11.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.11.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
29.11.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings - with annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
06.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2023 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.04.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.12.2022 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings and communication from Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2021 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2020 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |