EP3720117 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/21] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
For all designated states Arriola, George 6080 Center Drive 10th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARRIOLA, George 6080 Center Drive, 10th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | 02 /
YAMANAKA, Yasuhiro c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
KOBAYASHI, Motoki c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
HIRAMATSU, Shuji c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
SUGAWARA, Taku c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 06 /
BAGU CASAS, Anahi c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 07 /
KIMURA, Shinji c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 08 /
ENOMOTO, Shigeru c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 09 /
TANAKA, Yumiko c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/21] |
Former [2020/41] | 01 /
ARRIOLA, George 6080 Center Drive 10th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | ||
02 /
YAMANAKA, Yasuhiro c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
03 /
KOBAYASHI, Motoki c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
04 /
HIRAMATSU, Shuji c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
05 /
SUGAWARA, Taku c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
06 /
BAGU CASAS, Anahi c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
07 /
KIMURA, Shinji c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
08 /
ENOMOTO, Shigeru c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
09 /
TANAKA, Yumiko c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20174161.8 | 30.10.2013 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | US201261721572P | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261721572 P | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720117 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3720117 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, G06F3/0481 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (US);
A63F13/40 (US);
A63F13/52 (US);
G06F16/904 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N21/42209 (US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (US);
H04N21/4316 (US);
H04N21/47 (US);
H04N21/4781 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/41] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2020/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 17.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13851372.6 / EP2915328 | EP17208577.1 / EP3337162 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | MC | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | LU | 30.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005210410 (OHWA TSUNAYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0138]; figures 5,7-15 *; | [I]US2007192739 (HUNLETH FRANK A [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * * paragraph [0085]; figures 18-19 *; | [I]US2009172598 (YAMANAKA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0071]; figures 3-11 *; | [A]US2009193461 (YUKI TAICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0062]; figures 3, 4, 6 *; | [I]US2012221971 (TROTTA NICHOLAS [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * * page 2 - page 4; figures 1,4-5 * |