10.08.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
08.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
19.01.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
17.01.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.01.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.01.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.09.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
28.07.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
28.07.2023 |
Change - English title |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
28.07.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.06.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.06.2022 |
First examination report |
|
27.05.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
27.05.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
15.10.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.10.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
27.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|