Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11938754 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2024 | B2 | US2021354504 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20174331 | 13.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7342333B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2023 | B2 | JP2021178627 | 18.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20174331 | 13.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113665294B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2024 | B | CN113665294 | 19.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20174331 | 13.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3909784 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | B1 | EP3909784 | 17.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20174331 | 13.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102021000193 | 23.11.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP20174331 | 13.05.2020 |