EP3748574 - ADAPTIVE REMOVAL OF DIFFERENT TYPES OF INTERFERENCE FROM MEASUREMENT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Volker Strohgaeustr. 3 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Mummadi, Chaithanya Kumar Hausener Strasse 6 71296 Heimsheim / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 20174603.9 | 14.05.2020 | [2020/50] | Priority number, date | DE201910208265 | 06.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019208265 | [2020/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748574 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
G06T5/70 (EP,CN);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06T1/20 (CN);
G06T5/10 (CN);
G06T5/60 (EP);
G06T5/73 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2020/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE BEREINIGUNG VON MESSDATEN UM UNTERSCHIEDLICHE ARTEN VON STÖRUNGEN | [2020/50] | English: | ADAPTIVE REMOVAL OF DIFFERENT TYPES OF INTERFERENCE FROM MEASUREMENT DATA | [2020/50] | French: | CORRECTION ADAPTATIVE DES DONNÉES MESURÉES EN FONCTION DE DIFFÉRENTS TYPES DE DÉFAILLANCES | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 09.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - NI ZEHAO ET AL, Adaptive Image Filtering Based on Convolutional Neural Network, ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE THEORY AND APPLICATIONS OF CRYPTOGRAPHIC TECHNIQUES, EUROCRYPT 2018; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 369 - 379, (20180926), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP047487199 [X] 9-12,17-24 * the whole document * [A] 13-16 [I] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-030-00021-9_34 | [A] - SA P K ET AL, "Improved adaptive impulsive noise suppression", IEEE INTERNATIONAL FUZZY SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 2007. FUZZ-IEEE 2007 IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2007), ISBN 1-4244-1209-9, pages 288 - 291, XP002799876 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FUZZY.2007.4295380 | by applicant | WO2019007632 |