EP3750662 - SYSTEM COMPRISING AN INSPECTION DEVICE FOR LASER PROCESSING DEVICE, AND USE OF SUCH SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING SUCH LASER DEVICE FOR PROCESSING FIBER OPTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/51] | INSPECTION DEVICE FOR A LASER PROCESSING DEVICE | ||
[2022/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schäfer Werkzeug- und Sondermaschinenbau GmbH Dr.-Alfred-Weckesser-Strasse 6 76669 Bad Schönborn / DE | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäfer, Alexander Schäfer Werkzeug- und Sondermaschinenbau GmbH Dr.-Alfred-Weckesser-Str. 6 76669 Bad Schönborn-Langenbrücken / DE | 02 /
Saleh, Rekar Schäfer Werkzeug- und Sondermaschinenbau GmbH Dr.-Alfred-Weckesser-Str. 6 76669 Bad Schönborn-Langenbrücken / DE | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 20174664.1 | 14.05.2020 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | DE201910207237 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019207237 | [2020/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750662 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3750662 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/03, B23K26/21, B23K26/70 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
B23K26/21 (EP);
B23K26/032 (EP);
B23K26/705 (EP);
G02B6/3854 (EP);
G02B6/3855 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UMFASSEND EINE PRÜFEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LASERVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, UND VERWENDUNG EINES SOLCHEN SYSTEMS ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN LASEREINRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON LICHTWELLENLEITER | [2022/11] | English: | SYSTEM COMPRISING AN INSPECTION DEVICE FOR LASER PROCESSING DEVICE, AND USE OF SUCH SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING SUCH LASER DEVICE FOR PROCESSING FIBER OPTIC | [2022/11] | French: | SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE TEST POUR UN APPAREIL D'USINAGE LASER, ET UTILISATION D'UN TEL SYSTEME POUR LE REGLAGE D'UN TEL APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2022/11] |
Former [2020/51] | PRÜFEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LASERVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2020/51] | INSPECTION DEVICE FOR A LASER PROCESSING DEVICE | ||
Former [2020/51] | DISPOSITIF DE VÉRIFICATION POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'USINAGE LASER | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 19.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | DK | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | ES | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | NL | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | IE | 14.05.2023 | LU | 14.05.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 24.08.2022 | |
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 24.08.2022 | |
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19804029 (LESMUELLER LASERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-12 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 3; figure - * [I] 6; | [X]EP1211015 (MESSER CUTTING & WELDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; figure - *; | [X]EP1967316 (AIR LIQUIDE WELDING FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-12* paragraphs [0031] - [0034]; figure - *; | [X]US2018328725 (BORGSTROM ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031]; figure - * |