14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
26.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
09.12.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
16.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
31.12.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.02.2022 [2022/05] |
24.12.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.12.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.12.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.10.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.10.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
28.05.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.05.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
28.05.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
17.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.10.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
04.09.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
22.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|