EP3742363 - FOOD PRODUCTION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIDA CO., Ltd. 44, Sanno-cho, Shogoin Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states ISHIDA CO., Ltd. 44, Sanno-cho Shogoin Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARUMOTO, Yoshinori c/o Ishida Co., Ltd. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Youichirou c/o Ishida Co., Ltd. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | 03 /
KAWANISHI, Norio c/o Ishida Co., Ltd. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | 04 /
FUJITA, Yoshiki c/o Ishida Co., Ltd. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | 05 /
NADA, Taiga c/o Ishida Co., Ltd. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 20175882.8 | 21.05.2020 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | JP20190097160 | 23.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019097160 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742363 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/04 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0639 (EP,CN);
G06Q50/04 (EP,CN);
G05B19/41885 (US);
G05B19/41835 (US);
G06Q10/06316 (US);
G06Q10/0633 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2020/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANAGEMENTSYSTEM FÜR DIE LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTION | [2020/48] | English: | FOOD PRODUCTION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2020/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE LA PRODUCTION ALIMENTAIRE | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 10.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]JPH09301327 (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO) [ID] 1-10 * paragraph [0015]; figure 2 *; | [I]US2004107845 (SUNTER ADRIAN MEREDITH [GB], et al) [I] 1-10* figure 5A *; | [I]US2006231295 (YAMAGUCHI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0061] - [0074]; figure 2 * | by applicant | JPH09301327 |