EP3748270 - HYBRID TUBE BUNDLE EVAPORATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Hydronics & IT Cooling Systems S.p.A. Via Caduti di Cefalonia 1 36061 Bassano del Grappa (Vicenza) / IT | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COVOLO, Mariano Via Giuseppe Verdi, 8 36064 Mason Vicentino (Vicenza) / IT | 02 /
RUARO, Giacomo Via Strada Zenta 12/A 32032 Feltre (Belluno) / IT | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Rapisardi, Mariacristina Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l. Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 20175886.9 | 21.05.2020 | [2020/50] | Priority number, date | IT20190008127 | 05.06.2019 Original published format: IT201900008127 | [2020/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748270 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3748270 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/16, F25B39/02, F28D3/04, F28F9/22 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
F28D7/1607 (EP);
F25B39/028 (EP);
F28D3/04 (EP);
F28F9/22 (EP);
F28D2021/0071 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2020/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HYBRIDROHRBÜNDELVERDAMPFER | [2020/50] | English: | HYBRID TUBE BUNDLE EVAPORATOR | [2020/50] | French: | ÉVAPORATEUR DE FAISCEAU DE TUBES HYBRIDE | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 28.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | DK | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | ES | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | IT | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | NL | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006080998 (DE LARMINAT PAUL [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0038] - paragraph [0042]; figure 5 * [I] 14; | [X]US2010276130 (DE LARMINAT PAUL [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0049]; figures 5A,5B,5C,12 *; | [X]WO2011011421 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,14,15 * abstract *; | [XI]US2011120181 (DE LARMINAT PAUL [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0060]; figure 13 *[I] 14 |