EP3744885 - COVERING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/49] | SPIRALING MACHINE | ||
[2023/29] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Molteni, Maurizio Vicolo Passerero 11/G 24040 Casirate D'adda (BG) / IT | [2023/49] |
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states Molteni, Maurizio Via Giovanni da Verrazzano, 36 24047 Treviglio, Bergamo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 20175926.3 | 21.05.2020 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | IT20190007320 | 27.05.2019 Original published format: IT201900007320 | [2020/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744885 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744885 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/32 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
D02G3/322 (EP,US);
D02G3/328 (CN);
D02G3/32 (US);
D01H1/14 (US);
D01H1/18 (CN);
D01H1/36 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UMWINDEMASCHINE | [2023/29] | English: | COVERING MACHINE | [2023/29] | French: | MACHINE DE GUIPAGE | [2023/29] |
Former [2020/49] | SPIRALISIERMASCHINE | ||
Former [2020/49] | SPIRALING MACHINE | ||
Former [2020/49] | MACHINE À SPIRALISER | Examination procedure | 13.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 18.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2737773 (CLARKSON ROBERT J) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 15 - column 5, line 12; figures 1-2 * [I] 9; | [XI]US3287892 (DAVID RAPOZA) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 9 - line 13 * * column 2, line 5 - line 70 * * column 4, line 9 - line 48; figure 1 * [I] 9; | [XI]FR1489421 (DU PONT) [X] 1,7 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - line 40 * * page 2, column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 54; figure 1 * [I] 5,9; | [XI]WO9205302 (REGAL MFG [US]) [X] 1,7 * page 1, line 2 - line 7 * * page 4, line 31 - page 8, line 13; figures 1-2 *[I] 9 |