Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10690026 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2020 | B2 | US2019257229 | 22.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916403524 | 04.05.2019 | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | US201815762419 | 22.03.2018 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10690025 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2020 | B2 | US2018258805 | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180057660 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6802839B | Global Dossier | 23.12.2020 | B2 | JP2018528353 | 27.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3353393 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2020 | B1 | EP3353393 | 01.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108368758B | Global Dossier | 07.05.2021 | B | CN108368758 | 03.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2999211 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016328604 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3719270 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2021 | A3 | EP3719270 | 07.10.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | EP16770506 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018005885 | 16.10.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE212016000196U | 26.04.2018 | U1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2561092 | 03.06.2020 | B | GB2561092 | 03.10.2018 | A | GB201805932D0 | 23.05.2018 | D0 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018003479 | 23.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2018114304 | 23.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201801861 | 30.01.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP72768 | 23.09.2016 | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017051013 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201516854D0 | 04.11.2015 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201516854 | 23.09.2015 | Type | Earlier application | EP3353393 |