EP3719270 - FLUID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Circuloil Limited Platf9rm Floor 5 Tower Point 44 North Road Brighton BN1 1YR / GB | [2021/44] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states Castrol Limited Technology Centre Whitchurch Hill, Pangbourne, Reading RG8 7QR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODIER, Steven, Paul Whitchurch Hill Pangbourne Reading, Berkshire RG8 7QR / GB | 02 /
TAYLOR, Oliver, Paul Whitchurch Hill Pangbourne Reading, Berkshire RG8 7QR / GB | 03 /
BRETT, Peter, Stuart 4 Blenheim Road Caversham Reading, Berkshire RG4 7RS / GB | 04 /
FAIRS, Mike Melbourn Science Park Cambridge Road Melbourn Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 6EE / GB | 05 /
HARDING, Piers, Sebastian Melbourn Science Park Cambridge Road Melbourn Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 6EE / GB | 06 /
DAWSON, Christopher Melbourn Science Park Cambridge Road Melbourn Royston, hertfordshire SG8 6EE / GB | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Vienne, Aymeric Charles Emile, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20176037.8 | 23.09.2016 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | GB20150016854 | 23.09.2015 Original published format: GB 201516854 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3719270 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3719270 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/04 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
F01M11/04 (EP,KR,US);
F01M11/0458 (GB);
B60K11/02 (US);
B60S1/50 (US);
B60T17/06 (US);
F01M2011/0483 (EP,GB,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLUIDSYSTEM | [2020/41] | English: | FLUID SYSTEM | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FLUIDE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 09.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16770506.0 / EP3353393 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5442140U (-) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]JPS5594624U (-) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5476390 (TAGUCHI NAOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [I]JP2003042433 (SHARP KK) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0042] *; | [A]WO2014076316 (CASTROL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2015191156 (KISER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |