EP3748736 - DRY ELECTRODE MANUFACTURE BY TEMPERATURE ACTIVATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LiCAP Technologies, Inc. 9795 Business Park Drive Sacramento, California 95827 / US | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhong, Linda 9795 Business Park Drive Sacramento, California 95827 / US | 02 /
Qiu, Kathleen 9795 Business Park Drive Sacramento, California 95827 / US | 03 /
Zea, Martin 9795 Business Park Drive Sacramento, California 95827 / US | 04 /
Shaw, Erika 9795 Business Park Drive Sacramento, California 95827 / US | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Palladino, Saverio Massimo Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Pallini Gervasi, Diego Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 20176071.7 | 22.05.2020 | [2020/50] | Priority number, date | US201962857144P | 04.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962857144 P | US202016874502 | 14.05.2020 Original published format: US202016874502 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748736 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, // H01M4/505, H01M4/62 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
H01M4/0471 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/04 (KR);
H01M4/0435 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M4/0433 (US);
H01M4/131 (KR);
H01M4/133 (KR);
H01M4/1391 (KR);
H01M4/1393 (KR);
H01M4/623 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2020/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER TROCKENEN ELEKTRODE DURCH TEMPERATURAKTIVIERUNG | [2020/50] | English: | DRY ELECTRODE MANUFACTURE BY TEMPERATURE ACTIVATION METHOD | [2020/50] | French: | FABRICATION D'ÉLECTRODE SÈCHE PAR PROCÉDÉ D'ACTIVATION DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 09.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2022 | Observations by third parties | 31.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1421514 (ESB INC); | [Y]US2005271798 (ZHONG LINDA [US], et al); | [Y]US2018175366 (ZHENG JIAN-PING [US], et al); | [XI]KR20180102390 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US10069131 | other | US2004164440 | US5776637 | JPH113701 | US2013183577 | US2017250438 | US2020358100 |