Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3915531
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.05.2024 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.04.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2023 |
First examination report |
|
23.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
27.05.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
27.05.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
24.05.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
25.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|