Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023330319 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP63748 | 24.05.2021 | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230016628 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP63748 | 24.05.2021 | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023526486 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP63748 | 24.05.2021 | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4157175 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP63748 | 24.05.2021 | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115666469 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP63748 | 24.05.2021 | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3177150 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP63748 | 24.05.2021 | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021279130 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP63748 | 24.05.2021 | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022023293 | 20.12.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP63748 | 24.05.2021 | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021239653 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3915531 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | B1 | EP3915531 | 01.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3915531T | 17.06.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20176277 | 25.05.2020 |