EP3915531 - A NEGATIVE PRESSURE WOUND THERAPY (NPWT) DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mölnlycke Health Care AB Gamlestadsvägen 3 C 402 52 Göteborg / SE | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SVENSSON, Malin 414 53 GÖTEBORG / SE | 02 /
SKEPPSTEDT, Viktoria 426 58 VÄSTRA FRÖLUNDA / SE | 03 /
HOLMÉN, Malin 412 66 GÖTEBORG / SE | 04 /
BOLYOS, Elinor 438 91 LANDVETTER / SE | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20176277.0 | 25.05.2020 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915531 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3915531 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02, A61M1/00 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
A61F13/0206 (EP);
A61F13/05 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/915 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/0209 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/022 (KR);
A61F13/0223 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2021/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBAND FÜR UNTERDRUCKWUNDTHERAPIE (NPWT) | [2021/48] | English: | A NEGATIVE PRESSURE WOUND THERAPY (NPWT) DRESSING | [2021/48] | French: | PANSEMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE PLAIES PAR PRESSION NÉGATIVE (NPWT) | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 24.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2019084087 (KCI LICENSING INC [US]); | [A]WO2019171351 (SYSTAGENIX WOUND MAN LIMITED [GB]) | by applicant | EP20140194054 |