EP3916539 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENGINEERING A TECHNICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geipel, Markus Michael 80799 München / DE | 02 /
Montrone, Francesco 85521 Riemerling / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20176501.3 | 26.05.2020 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916539 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/30, // G05B19/418, G06F8/33, G06F8/35 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
G06F8/315 (EP,US);
G06F8/35 (EP,US);
G06F8/33 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTWICKLUNG EINES TECHNISCHEN SYSTEMS | [2021/48] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENGINEERING A TECHNICAL SYSTEM | [2021/48] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONCEPTION D'UN SYSTÈME TECHNIQUE | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/45] | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US10606562 (NOETZELMANN OSWIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 6 *; | [XI]EP3640793 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,11,12,15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 2-10,13,14; | [A] - Torero Consortium, "Work Package 1 - Overall system design and specification - Task 1.2 - Review of the requirement analysis and state of the art, and detailed specification", TORERO IST-2001-3757 european project deliverables, (20030819), pages 1 - 147, URL: http://www.uni-magdeburg.de/iaf/cvs/torero/downloads/De1.2_MainDoc_030819_Final.pdf, (20130827), XP055076638 [A] 1-15 * page 21, line 26 - page 22, line 29 * * page 39, line 1 - line 5 * * page 48, line 6 - page 69, line 28 * * page 66, line 1 - line 5 * * page 133, line 19 - line 21 * |