EP3916995 - PLANAR DRIVE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckhoff Automation GmbH Hülshorstweg 20 33415 Verl / DE | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTFELD, Lukas 33129 Delbrück / DE | 02 /
BRINKMANN, Rolf 32107 Bad Salzuflen / DE | 03 /
JEBRAMCIK, Patrick 33334 Gütersloh / DE | 04 /
KAULMANN, Tim 33104 Paderborn / DE | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20176561.7 | 26.05.2020 | [2021/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916995 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/10, H02J50/10, H02J50/80, H02K11/042, H02K11/35, H02K41/03, H02P25/06, H02P29/40, H02P29/50, // B65G49/08 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H02P6/10 (EP,US);
H02K11/35 (EP);
H02K41/031 (EP);
H02P25/06 (EP);
H02P25/064 (US);
H02P29/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANARANTRIEBSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES PLANARANTRIEBSSYSTEMS | [2021/48] | English: | PLANAR DRIVE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2021/48] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT PLANAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT PLANAIRE | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/45] | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010175943 (BERGMANN LARS B [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102009014960 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,2,7,10,11,17,20 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010112132 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [Y] 1-20* the whole document *; | [Y]EP3457558 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * |