26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
30.06.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
22.07.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
22.07.2022 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
20.07.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.07.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.07.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.02.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
26.10.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.10.2021 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
11.10.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.09.2021 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
18.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.04.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
30.04.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
28.09.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
30.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|