Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11622617 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2023 | B2 | US2019246778 | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12004914 | 02.07.2012 | WO2013EP01412 | 14.05.2013 | US201916396044 | 26.04.2019 | US201414410536 | 22.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10299577 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B2 | US2015335141 | 26.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12004914 | 02.07.2012 | WO2013EP01412 | 14.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4098147 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13725569 | 14.05.2013 | EP12004914 | 02.07.2012 | EP15179848 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013EP01412 | 14.05.2013 | EP20176973 | 14.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2974619 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | B1 | EP2974619 | 06.04.2016 | A3 | EP2974619 | 20.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP13725569 | 14.05.2013 | EP12004914 | 02.07.2012 | WO2013EP01412 | 14.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2866610 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13725569 | 14.05.2013 | EP12004914 | 02.07.2012 | WO2013EP01412 | 14.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3729997 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2022 | B1 | EP3729997 | 28.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13725569 | 14.05.2013 | EP12004914 | 02.07.2012 | EP15179848 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013EP01412 | 14.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014005659 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12004914 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Divisional application | EP4098147 | Type | Earlier application | EP2866610 | EP2974619 |