Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10868482 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2020 | B1 | US2020382029 | 03.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916423646 | 28.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3745588 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2023 | B1 | EP3745588 | 02.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916423646 | 28.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3745588T | 14.08.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201916423646 | 28.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2951517T | 23.10.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201916423646 | 28.05.2019 |