EP3745588 - DUAL-FREQUENCY FILTER FOR DISTINGUISHING BETWEEN DIFFERENT TYPES OF GRID EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Renovables España, S.L. Calle Roc Boronat 78 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2023/50] |
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Dustin General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | 02 /
Larsen, Einar Vaughn General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | 03 /
Berroteran, Igor General Electric Company 1501 Roanoke Boulevard Salem, VA 24153 / US | 04 /
Kazemi, Reza General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 20177169.8 | 28.05.2020 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | US201916423646 | 28.05.2019 Original published format: US201916423646 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3745588 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3745588 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00, H02J3/38, H02P9/00 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H02P9/007 (EP,US);
F03D7/0272 (US);
H02J3/00 (US);
H02J3/0012 (EP);
H02J3/381 (EP);
H02P9/02 (US);
F03D9/257 (US);
F05B2270/337 (US);
H02J2300/28 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | H02P9/00, H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DOPPELFREQUENZFILTER ZUR UNTERSCHEIDUNG ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN ARTEN VON NETZEREIGNISSEN | [2020/49] | English: | DUAL-FREQUENCY FILTER FOR DISTINGUISHING BETWEEN DIFFERENT TYPES OF GRID EVENTS | [2020/49] | French: | FILTRE À DOUBLE FRÉQUENCE POUR DISTINGUER ENTRE DIFFÉRENTS TYPES D'ÉVÉNEMENTS DE GRILLE | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 02.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | MC | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | IE | 28.05.2023 | LU | 28.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | FR | 24.07.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 28.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
FR | 24.07.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 28.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 25.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10136639 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] * * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] ** figures 1, 2, 6 *; | [Y]US2015249416 (BARKER SIDNEY ALLEN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [00 8] , [00 9] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0 50] * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0030] - [0 32] - [0034] * |