EP3916842 - ELECTRODE BINDER COMPOSITION FOR LITHIUM ION ELECTRICAL STORAGE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA INC. 900 First Avenue, Bldg. 4-2 King of Prussia PA 19406 / US | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Dong Changshu, Jiangsu 215522 / CN | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20177529.3 | 29.05.2020 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916842 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, H01M4/136, H01M4/62, H01M10/0525 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H01M4/136 (EP,KR);
H01M4/623 (EP,KR,US);
C08F14/22 (KR);
C08L27/12 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0404 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0471 (US);
H01M4/131 (US);
H01M4/1397 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENBINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR LITHIUM-IONEN-STROMSPEICHERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/48] | English: | ELECTRODE BINDER COMPOSITION FOR LITHIUM ION ELECTRICAL STORAGE DEVICES | [2021/48] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LIANT D'ÉLECTRODE POUR DES DISPOSITIFS DE STOCKAGE ÉLECTRIQUE AU LITHIUM ION | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 31.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015017532 (IGUCHI TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [X]JP2018060745 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [X]US2019296359 (ASANO KAZUYA [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2017373319 |