EP3741971 - MICRO GAS TURBINE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Dr. Andreas Schwalbenweg 33 78549 Spaichingen / DE | 02 /
Henke, Martin Helmut von Glasenapp Straße 9 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 20177741.4 | 21.11.2014 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | DE201310112892 | 21.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013112892 | [2020/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3741971 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/13, F02C7/08, F01D15/10, F01D19/00, F02C7/143, F02C9/18 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
F02C7/08 (EP);
F01D15/10 (EP);
F01D19/00 (EP);
F02C3/13 (EP);
F02C7/143 (EP);
F02C9/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROGASTURBINENANORDNUNG | [2020/48] | English: | MICRO GAS TURBINE ASSEMBLY | [2020/48] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE MICROTURBINE À GAZ | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 18.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14194344.9 / EP2876280 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002004814 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1,2 * figure 2 ** abstract *; | [A]WO2005096769 (MECHANOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 * * page 1 - page 2 * * page 6 * * page 7 *; | [A]US2006272331 (BUCKER DOMINIKUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0021] * | by applicant | JP2002004814 |