EP3747785 - PACKAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACCOR Packaging GmbH Peter-Müller-Straße 16/16a 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCOURT, Kevin 48 East Law Consett, Durham DH8 0QH / GB | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20177804.0 | 02.06.2020 | [2020/50] | Priority number, date | GB20190007898 | 04.06.2019 Original published format: GB 201907898 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747785 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/16, B65D43/02, B65D43/06, B65D51/28 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
B65D43/0239 (EP);
B65D43/0225 (GB);
B65D43/0229 (US);
B29C51/30 (US);
B29C51/42 (US);
B65D1/16 (EP);
B65D43/065 (EP,GB);
B65D51/28 (EP);
B65D77/04 (GB);
B29L2031/565 (US);
B29L2031/712 (US);
B65D2251/023 (EP);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00351 (EP);
B65D2543/0049 (US);
B65D2543/00509 (EP);
B65D2543/00546 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/50] | English: | PACKAGING SYSTEM | [2020/50] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EMBALLAGE | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0064771 (LJUNGQVIST CHRISTER [SE], et al) [X] 1-8,12-15 * abstract * * page 8, line 28 - line 32 * * page 10, line 22 * [Y] 9-11; | [X]US2005161455 (STUDEE STEPHEN [US]) [X] 1-4,8,12-15 * abstract *; | [Y]US2005224498 (SAVICKI ALAN F [US]) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [Y]US2009145908 (VOVAN TERRY [US]) [Y] 10,11 * abstract * |