EP3919208 - DRILLING SYSTEM COMPRISING A CORE DRILL AND A FEED DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AND ELIMINATING BLOCKAGE OF A DRILL BIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sattler, Christian 87640 Biessenhofen / DE | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20177841.2 | 02.06.2020 | [2021/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919208 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/04, B28D1/04, B28D7/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
B28D1/041 (EP);
B23B51/04 (EP);
B28D7/005 (EP);
B23B2260/128 (EP);
B23B2270/32 (EP);
B23B2270/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRSYSTEM, DAS EIN KERNBOHRGERÄT UND EINE VORSCHUBVORRICHTUNG UMFASST, UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG UND BESEITIGUNG EINER BLOCKADE EINER BOHRKRONE | [2021/49] | English: | DRILLING SYSTEM COMPRISING A CORE DRILL AND A FEED DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AND ELIMINATING BLOCKAGE OF A DRILL BIT | [2021/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FORAGE COMPRENANT UN APPAREIL DE CAROTTAGE ET UN DISPOSITIF D'AVANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION ET D'ÉLIMINATION D'UN BLOCAGE D'UNE COURONNE DE CAROTTIER | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 15.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH07246614 (BABU HITACHI KOGYO KK, et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] , [0029] , [0039]; figures 1-13 * [Y] 10; | [XYI]EP3088135 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0041] , [0043]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 9 [I] 6,8,11; | [Y]EP3088151 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0044]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP3170624 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 10* paragraphs [0026] - [0028]; figures 1-3 * |