EP3919047 - MICROEMULSION FOR THE TREATMENT OF DRY EYE SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZAD Pharma AG Durachweg 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLI, Fabio 34127 Trieste / IT | 02 /
CHIELLINI, Elisabetta 34127 Trieste / IT | 03 /
BARONIAN, Mihran 3125 Toffen / CH | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20178029.3 | 03.06.2020 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919047 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/107, A61K47/02, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K47/26, A61K47/36, A61P27/04 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/02 (EP,IL);
A61K47/12 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/44 (KR);
A61K9/0048 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P27/04 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROEMULSION ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES TROCKENEN-AUGEN-SYNDROMS | [2021/49] | English: | MICROEMULSION FOR THE TREATMENT OF DRY EYE SYNDROME | [2021/49] | French: | MICROÉMULSION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU SYNDROME DE L' IL SEC | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/46] | 11.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08104642 (TAKADA SEIYAKU KK) [A] 1-15* claims 1-3 *; | [X]US2010266710 (BARONIAN MIHRAN [CH]) [X] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [X]US2015139973 (STEINFELD UTE [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,11-15 * paragraph [0191] *; | [XD]WO2019036625 (AKRIVISTA LLC [US]) [XD] 1-4,8,9,11-15 * table 1 * | by applicant | EP3409268 | WO2019036625 |