Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021128046 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514628525 | 23.02.2015 | US201461945424 | 27.02.2014 | US201615375861 | 12.12.2016 | US202117146518 | 12.01.2021 | US201815941386 | 30.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9545209 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2017 | B2 | US2015238101 | 27.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514628525 | 23.02.2015 | US201461945424 | 27.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10918294 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2021 | B2 | US2018220914 | 09.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514628525 | 23.02.2015 | US201461945424 | 27.02.2014 | US201615375861 | 12.12.2016 | US201815941386 | 30.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10143392 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2018 | B2 | US2017112400 | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514628525 | 23.02.2015 | US201461945424 | 27.02.2014 | US201615375861 | 12.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3110316 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | B1 | EP3110316 | 25.10.2017 | A4 | EP3110316 | 04.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461945424 | 27.02.2014 | WO2015US17050 | 23.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3721794 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2022 | B1 | EP3721794 | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461945424 | 27.02.2014 | EP15755265 | 23.02.2015 | WO2015US17050 | 23.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015130596 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461945424 | 27.02.2014 | Type | Earlier application | EP3110316 |