EP3721794 - VCG VECTOR LOOP BIFURCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoll Medical Corporation 269 Mill Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENG, Binwei 12 Elysian Drive Andover, MA 08181 / US | 02 /
HERKEN, Ulrich 109 Brooks Street Medford, MA 02155 / US | 03 /
FREEMAN, Gary A. 105 Riverview Avenue Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2021/43] |
Former [2020/46] | 01 /
WENG, Binwei 12 Elysian Drive Andover, MA 08181 / US | ||
02 /
HERKEN, Ulrich 109 Brooks Street Medford, MA Massachusetts 02155 / US | |||
03 /
FREEMAN, Gary A. 105 Riverview Avenue Waltham, MA Massachusetts 02453 / US | |||
Former [2020/42] | 01 /
WENG, Binwei 44 Boston Road 107 Chelmsford, MA Massachusetts 01824 / US | ||
02 /
HERKEN, Ulrich 109 Brooks Street Medford, MA Massachusetts 02155 / US | |||
03 /
FREEMAN, Gary A. 105 Riverview Avenue Waltham, MA Massachusetts 02453 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20178061.6 | 23.02.2015 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | US201461945424P | 27.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461945424 P | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721794 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3721794 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, G06F17/00, A61B5/00, A61N1/39 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A61N1/3925 (EP,US);
A61B5/341 (EP,US);
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (EP,US);
A61B5/339 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61N1/3904 (EP,US);
A61N1/3987 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/42] | A61B5/02, A61B5/0452, G06F17/00, A61B5/00, A61N1/39, A61B5/04, A61B5/044, A61B5/0408 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VCG-VEKTORSCHLEIFENBIFURKATION | [2020/42] | English: | VCG VECTOR LOOP BIFURCATION | [2020/42] | French: | BIFURCATION DE BOUCLE DE VECTEUR VCG | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 13.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15755265.4 / EP3110316 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2015 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | ES | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | IE | 23.02.2022 | IT | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LU | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | NL | 23.02.2022 | PL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SE | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0086429 (SANZ ERNST DR MED [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 33, lines 20, 21 * * page 42, lines 4, 5 ** figures 8, 11 *; | [X]WO9520351 (CAMBRIDGE HEART INC [US]) [X] 1-6,13-15 * page 2, lines 5-6 * * page 15, lines 9-13 * * page 19, lines 9, 10 * * page 20, lines 11, 12 * * page 47, lines 10-14 * * page 57, line 21 - page 58, line 10 * * page 61, lines 11, 12 * * page 62, lines 14-16 * * figure 22 *; | [Y]US7123954 (NARAYAN SANJIV MATHUR [US], et al) [Y] 8 * figures 1, 11 * * claim 1 * * column 31, lines 20-24 *; | [A]US2006258947 (OLSON CHARLES [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008085179 (NEWCARDIO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2012106729 (PHASE SPACE SYSTEMS CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-13,15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36] , [0 51] , [0 63] , [0 76] , [0 79] , [0 84] * * figures 9-11, 18 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y] - RAÚL CORREA ET AL, "Novel set of vectorcardiographic parameters for the identification of ischemic patients", MEDICAL ENGINEERING & PHYSICS., GB, (20130101), vol. 35, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.medengphy.2012.03.005, ISSN 1350-4533, pages 16 - 22, XP055406934 [Y] 7 * chapter "3.4 Parameters' computation" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.medengphy.2012.03.005 | [A] - THOMAS HUEBNER ET AL, "Cardiogoniometric parameters for detection of coronary artery disease at rest as a function of stenosis localization and distribution", MEDICAL & BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING & COMPUTING, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20100319), vol. 48, no. 5, ISSN 1741-0444, pages 435 - 446, XP019835497 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |