EP3799317 - CIRCULATOR DISTORTION CANCELLATION SUBSYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andrew Wireless Systems GmbH Industriering 10 86675 Buchdorf / DE | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRISON, Charles B. 102 Berkley Place Forest, VA Virginia 24551 / US | 02 /
MACA, Gregory Allan 115 Bethel Park Drive Lynchburg, VA Virginia 24502 / US | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2022/46] |
Former [2021/13] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20178234.9 | 08.12.2015 | [2021/13] | Priority number, date | US201562152115P | 24.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562152115 P | [2021/13] | Previously filed application, date | WO2015IB59445 | 08.12.2015 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799317 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3799317 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/48, H04B1/52 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
H04B1/48 (EP,US);
H04B1/525 (CN);
H04B1/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNTERSYSTEM ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON ZIRKULATORVERZERRUNGEN | [2021/13] | English: | CIRCULATOR DISTORTION CANCELLATION SUBSYSTEM | [2021/13] | French: | SOUS-SYSTÈME D'ANNULATION DE DISTORSION DE CIRCULATEUR | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 25.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15808470.7 / EP3286840 | Divisional application(s) | EP22206570.8 / EP4156529 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2015 | AL | 16.11.2022 | AT | 16.11.2022 | BG | 16.11.2022 | CY | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | MK | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | TR | 16.11.2022 | IE | 08.12.2022 | LU | 08.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AL | 16.11.2022 | ||
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CY | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
MK | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
TR | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.12.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AL | 16.11.2022 | ||
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CY | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MK | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.12.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AL | 16.11.2022 | ||
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CY | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.12.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CY | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.12.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.12.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.12.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.12.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012166961 (ANDREW LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] ** paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0099] *; | [A]US2013155913 (SARCA OCTAVIAN [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]EP2752997 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0041] * |