EP3726783 - HASH-BASED MULTI-HOMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORCKIT IP, LLC 831 Beacon Street Suite 307 Newton, MA 02459 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGMON, Gideon 11 Mishol Ha'ahava Street 44601 Kfar Sava / IL | 02 /
ZELIG, David 19 Hatomer Street 3090501 Zichron-Yaakov / IL | 03 /
MENAHEMI, Zvika 91 Shimon Street 71700 Modi'in / IL | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Kurig, Thomas Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Kurig, Thomas Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20178242.2 | 12.11.2007 | [2020/43] | Priority number, date | US200655903706 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: US 55903706 | US20060559037 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: US 559037 | US200777828607 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: US 77828607 | US20070778286 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: US 778286 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726783 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3726783 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H04L12/4641 (EP,US);
H04L12/50 (KR);
H04L12/4625 (EP);
H04L45/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04L45/245 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | H04L12/46, H04L12/701, H04L12/709, H04L12/801, H04L12/803, // H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/50] |
Former [2020/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HASH-BASIERTES MULTIHOMING | [2020/43] | English: | HASH-BASED MULTI-HOMING | [2020/43] | French: | MULTIHÉBERGEMENT BASÉ SUR LE HACHAGE | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 02.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07827358.8 / EP2104994 | EP17185828.5 / EP3267637 | EP18208779.1 / EP3474498 | Divisional application(s) | EP21174671.4 / EP3890250 | EP23208546.4 / EP4297351 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2007 | AT | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | ES | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | IT | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MT | 30.06.2021 | NL | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | TR | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | GB | 12.11.2021 | IE | 12.11.2021 | LU | 12.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 12.11.2007 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
TR | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
GB | 12.11.2021 | ||
IE | 12.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 12.11.2007 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
GB | 12.11.2021 | ||
IE | 12.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
GB | 12.11.2021 | ||
IE | 12.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
GB | 12.11.2021 | ||
IE | 12.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
GB | 12.11.2021 | ||
IE | 12.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
GB | 12.11.2021 | ||
IE | 12.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
GB | 12.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 12.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003128706 (MARK BARRY DING KEN [CA], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0030] - [0048]; figure 4A *; | [A]US2003223424 (ANDERSON ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0024] - [0047]; figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]US6778495 (BLAIR DANA [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 5, line 40 - column 11, line 11 *; | [A] - JU-YEON JO ET AL, "Hash-based internet traffic load balancing", INFORMATION REUSE AND INTEGRATION, 2004. IRI 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LAS VEGAS, NV, USA NOV. 8-10, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041108), doi:10.1109/IRI.2004.1431461, ISBN 978-0-7803-8819-2, pages 204 - 209, XP010798675 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * sections 1 and 2; pages 204-207 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IRI.2004.1431461 |