EP3726814 - NETWORK INTERFACE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xilinx, Inc. 2100 Logic Drive San Jose, California 95124 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POPE, Steve 25 Greville Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 3QJ / GB | 02 /
ROBERTS, Derek 25 Metcalfe Road Cambridge, cambridgeshire CB4 2DB / GB | 03 /
RIDDOCH, David The Elms 9 Talls Lane Fenstanten, cambridgeshire PE28 9JJ / GB | 04 /
KITARIEV, Dmitri 4300 Avenue of Arts Costa Mesa CA 92626 / US | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 20178304.0 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/43] | Priority number, date | US201715847778 | 19.12.2017 Original published format: US201715847778 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726814 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/935 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
H04L49/30 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
G06F9/5044 (EP,US);
H04L45/38 (US);
H04L49/3072 (US);
H04L63/1416 (US);
H04L63/1458 (US);
H04L63/166 (US);
H04L67/59 (EP,US);
G06F16/213 (US);
G06F2209/509 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2020/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NETZWERKSCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2020/43] | English: | NETWORK INTERFACE DEVICE | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE DE RÉSEAU | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 07.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18214201.8 / EP3503507 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - HANKOOK JANG ET AL, Implementation of a Hybrid TCP/IP Offload Engine Prototype, ADVANCES IN COMPUTER SYSTEMS ARCHITECTURE LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 464 - 477, (20050101), ISBN 978-3-540-29643-0, XP019022380 [X] 1-4,7-9,13-15 * chapter 3 Hybrid TOE Architecture;; figures 1,2,6 * * chapter 4.4 TOE Hardware Module and Coprocessing Mechanism * * chapter 4.3 TOE Software Module * * ch. 4.2.TOE Interface and Protocol Stack for Hybrid TOE * * abstract * [I] 5,6,10-12 |