Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
24.02.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
21.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.10.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.10.2022 | First examination report | |
17.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.04.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
09.04.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] |
09.04.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] |
07.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.12.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.09.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
05.06.2020 | Change - representative |