EP3753700 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE RIM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marshal Industrial Corp. Vistra Corporate Services Centre Wickhams Cay II, Road Town VG1110 Tortola / VG | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsai, Ming-Jen No.1283, Ren'ai Rd. 350 Zhunan Township, Miaoli County / TW | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20178393.3 | 04.06.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | TW20190121609 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: TW 108121609 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753700 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3753700 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/44, B29C33/50, B29C44/18, B29C44/34, // B29L31/30, B29L31/32 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
B29C70/446 (EP,US);
B29C33/505 (EP);
B29C44/181 (EP);
B29C44/182 (EP);
B29C44/3415 (EP);
B29C70/42 (US);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B29L2031/3091 (EP);
B29L2031/32 (US);
B29L2031/322 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | B29C33/50, B29C70/44, B29L31/32, B29L31/30, B29C44/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERBUNDFELGE | [2020/52] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE RIM | [2020/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE JANTE COMPOSITE | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | IE | 04.06.2023 | LU | 04.06.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
IE | 04.06.2023 | ||
LU | 04.06.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 04.06.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5006298 (TSAI KO-JAN C [TW]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 49 - line 64 * [A] 5,6 [I] 2-4,7-10; | [A]JPH11349908 (HITACHI KASEI POLYMER CO LTD) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] *; | [A]US2004227393 (MEGGIOLAN MARIO [IT]) [A] 1* figures 3,4; claims 1,2 *; | [A]TW201043294 (CHIN CHIA SHUN ENTPR CO LTD [TW]) [A] 6 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2012242138 (TSAI WEN-FENG [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0015]; figure 5 *; | [A]WO2019113701 (FALCON COMPOSITES CORP [CA]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] - [ 131] - [0132] - [ 156] , [ 157]; figure 5; claim 27 * |