EP3923261 - PROVIDING GUIDANCE TO DEVICE USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Medema, Janine Willemijn 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Godlieb, Robert 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20178820.5 | 08.06.2020 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923261 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09B19/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G09B19/0076 (EP);
G09B19/0084 (EP,US);
B26B19/388 (EP);
G09B19/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG EINER ANLEITUNG FÜR GERÄTEBENUTZER | [2021/50] | English: | PROVIDING GUIDANCE TO DEVICE USERS | [2021/50] | French: | FOURNITURE DE GUIDAGE À DES UTILISATEURS DE DISPOSITIFS | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 07.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2017529178 (KONINKLIJKE PHILLIPS N.V.) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0040] *; | [I]US2018236675 (WESTERHOF WILLEM AUKE [NL], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0024] *; | [A]WO2019001894 (BIC VIOLEX SA [GR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0030] , [0035] , [0042] , [0044] , [0052] , [0055]; figures 1,3 *; | [I]WO2019102480 (DENTLYTEC G P L LTD [IL]) [I] 1-15 * figures 4,9 * * pages 4,10,12 * * page 14 * * pages 26,35 *; | [A]US2019200746 (SERVAL THOMAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0066] , [0106]; figures 4,7 * |