EP3739364 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING AN IMAGE OF POST-STACK SEISMIC DATA WITH PRE-STACK SEISMIC DATA FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landmark Graphics Corporation 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerr, John D. 41 Browning Avenue Sutton, Surrey SM1 3QU / GB | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 20178929.4 | 20.09.2006 | [2020/47] | Priority number, date | US20050231262 | 20.09.2005 Original published format: US 231262 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739364 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/34, // G01V1/30 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
G01V1/34 (EP,NO,US);
G01V1/301 (EP,NO,US);
G01V2210/60 (NO);
G01V2210/632 (EP,US);
G01V2210/74 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBESSERN EINES ABBILDS VON SEISMISCHEN POST-STACK-DATEN MIT SEISMISCHEN PRE-STACK-DATENMERKMALEN | [2020/47] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING AN IMAGE OF POST-STACK SEISMIC DATA WITH PRE-STACK SEISMIC DATA FEATURES | [2020/47] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER UNE IMAGE DE DONNÉES SISMIQUES APRÈS SOMMATION AVEC DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE DONNÉES SISMIQUES AVANT SOMMATION | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06803874.4 / EP1941301 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4646239 (BODINE JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 4-15,19,20 * * column 3, line 42 - column 6, line 27 * * column 8, line 44 - column 11, line 35 * * column 11, line 67 - column 12, line 7 ** column 12, line 29 - line 61 *; | [XYI] - Einar Kjartansson, "Analysis of Variations in Amplitudes and Traveltimes with Offset and Midpoint", Analysis of Variations in Amplitudes and Traveltimes with Offset and Midpoint, Stanford Exploration Project, (19791031), vol. SEP-20, pages 1 - 24, XP055492232 [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 20 * * page 3 - page 5 * * page 8 - page 10 * * page 11, line 17 - line 25 * * page 23 - page 24 * [Y] 4 [I] 8-10 | [A] - Ioan Vlad, "Focusing-effect AVO/AVA: overview of results and assessment of problems", SEP-120, http://sepwww.stanford.edu/data/media/public/docs/sep120/, Stanford Exploration Project, (20050303), vol. 120, pages 217 - 237, XP055492254 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 220 - page 222 * * page 225 - page 231 * | [YDA] - PAUL J HATCHELL, "Case History Fault whispers: Transmission distortions on prestack seismic reflection data", GEOPHYSICS, (20000401), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 0016-8033, pages 377 - 389, XP055186269 [YD] 4 * page 377 - page 380 * * page 382 - page 383 * [A] 1-3,5-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1444733 |