EP3744362 - BLOOD PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magenta Medical Ltd. Haofeh 1 60920 Kadima / IL | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwammenthal, Euhd Haavoda 5A Raanana 4341103 / IL | 02 /
Tuval, Yosi Hashalom 8 Even Yehuda 4050426 / IL | 03 /
Glozman, Daniel Odem 37a Kfar Yona / IL | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 20179137.3 | 19.05.2015 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | US201462000192P | 19.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462000192 P | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744362 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744362 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M60/13, A61M60/216, A61M60/33, A61M60/34, A61M60/806, A61M60/81 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
A61M60/33 (EP);
A61M60/205 (CN);
A61M60/81 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/13 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/216 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/34 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/806 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/068 (EP);
A61M60/148 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | A61M1/10, A61M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | BLUTPUMPE | [2020/49] | English: | BLOOD PUMP | [2020/49] | French: | POMPE SANGUINE | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 27.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15753493.4 / EP3145559 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005020848 (ADVANCED RES & TECH INST [US], et al); | [A]US7780628 (KEREN GAD [IL], et al); | [A]AU2013205145 (HEARTWARE INC); | [X]US2014128659 (HEURING JASON J [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2013183060 | WO2014141284 | WO2013IL50495 | WO2014IL50289 |